MA H4486 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 157 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 157 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House, No. 4479, as changed by the committee on Bills in the Third Reading, and as amended and passed to be engrossed by the House. May 9, 2018.
Title
Protecting youth from the health risks of tobacco and nicotine addiction
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-07-18 - House - House On adoption of the further amendment Yea and Nay No. 410 (Y: 146 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - Senate - Senate Passed to be engrossed Roll Call #437 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - Senate - Senate Passed to be engrossed Roll Call #437 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-27 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 157 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-07-19 | House | Enacted |
2018-07-18 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment -see Roll Call #453 (Yeas 32 to Nays 3) |
2018-07-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-07-18 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment, see H4784 - 146 YEAS to 3 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 410) |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #437 (Yeas 33 - Nays 3) |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Reprinted as amended, see S2585 |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Read third |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2571 |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Read second |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, June 28, 2018 |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2571 |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-05-09 | House | H4479, published as amended |
Same As/Similar To
H4479 (Replaces) 2018-05-10 - Published as amended, see H4486
H4109 (Similar To) 2018-05-09 - New draft substituted, see H4479
H1000 (Similar To) 2018-05-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H890 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1011 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
S2571 (Similar To) 2018-06-28 - See H4486
S2585 (Replaces) 2018-06-28 - See H4486
H4784 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Text of an amendment, see H4486
H4109 (Similar To) 2018-05-09 - New draft substituted, see H4479
H1000 (Similar To) 2018-05-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H890 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1011 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
S2571 (Similar To) 2018-06-28 - See H4486
S2585 (Replaces) 2018-06-28 - See H4486
H4784 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Text of an amendment, see H4486