MA H1011 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4729
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to dedicate a portion of certain grants to promote community on-the-job training for youths. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Promoting community on-the-job training for youths
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Tackey Chan [D] | Rep. Juana Matias [D] | Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] |
Rep. Jose Tosado [D] | Rep. Bud Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4729 |
2017-05-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1000 (Similar To) 2018-05-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S234 (Similar To) 2017-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2071
S215 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H607 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S307 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H1043 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H890 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2071 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - New draft substituted, see S2113
S2128 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2306 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - New draft substituted, see S2355
H4729 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S234 (Similar To) 2017-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2071
S215 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H607 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S307 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H1043 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H890 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2071 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - New draft substituted, see S2113
S2128 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2306 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - New draft substituted, see S2355
H4729 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1011 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1011.pdf |