MA S845 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2714
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase access to higher education for disadvantaged students. Higher Education.
Title
To increase access to higher education for disadvantaged students
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2714 |
2021-07-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S192 (Similar To) 2021-11-04 - Accompanied S211
S765 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S844 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H2500 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
S823 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H4018 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2021
H4056 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4018
S2519 (Similar To) 2021-09-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4120 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5219
H1749 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S806 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S849 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S357 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2749
H2786 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H865 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S1304 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1346 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2146 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S629 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S821 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2746
S2714 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4930 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Published as amended, see H4954
H4954 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Reported by H5090
S825 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S826 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H1328 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1327 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5174
S765 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S844 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H2500 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
S823 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H4018 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2021
H4056 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4018
S2519 (Similar To) 2021-09-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4120 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5219
H1749 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S806 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S849 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S357 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2749
H2786 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H865 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S1304 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1346 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2146 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S629 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S821 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2746
S2714 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4930 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Published as amended, see H4954
H4954 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Reported by H5090
S825 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S826 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H1328 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1327 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5174
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S845 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S845.pdf |