MA H4930 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H2264
Note: Legislation replaced by H4954

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-1)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Published as amended, see H4954
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding protections for reproductive rights

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding protections for reproductive rights

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-06-29 - House - House Passed to be engrossed - 136 YEAS to 17 NAYS (Y: 136 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-29HousePublished as amended, see H4954
2022-06-29HouseAmendment 11 adopted
2022-06-29HouseAmendment 8 rejected
2022-06-29HouseAmendment 7 rejected
2022-06-29HouseAmendment 6 rejected
2022-06-29HouseFurther amendment adopted, precluding vote on underlying amendment
2022-06-29HouseAmendment 12 pending
2022-06-29HouseAmendment 9 adopted
2022-06-29HouseAmendment 3 rejected
2022-06-29HouseAmendment 2 rejected
2022-06-29HouseAmendment 1 rejected
2022-06-29HouseRead third
2022-06-29HouseRules suspended
2022-06-28HouseOrdered to a third reading
2022-06-28HouseNew draft of H2264
2022-06-28HousePending new draft of H2264
2022-06-28HouseReported from the committee on House Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

H2264 (Replaces) 2022-06-28 - New draft substituted, see H4930
S192 (Similar To) 2021-11-04 - Accompanied S211
S765 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S879 (Similar To) 2021-09-29 - Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2146 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H4954 (Replaced by) 2022-07-25 - Reported by H5090
H5090 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 127 of the Acts of 2022
S3097 (Similar To) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 177 of the Acts of 2022

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback