MA S685 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2487
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the eligibility of students for in-state tuition rates and fees at public higher educational institutions. Higher Education.
Title
Regarding tuition equity for high school graduates in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2487 |
2017-05-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S1577 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1533 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S688 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S957 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1025 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1383 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S112 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S680 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - New draft substituted, see S2247
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H1920 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4376
H636 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H637 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
S2081 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2191
H12 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2487 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1533 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S688 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S957 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1025 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1383 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S112 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S680 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - New draft substituted, see S2247
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H1920 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4376
H636 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H637 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
S2081 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2191
H12 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2487 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S685 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S685.pdf |