MA S657 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2183

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2183
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to expanding the community college workforce training incentive program. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding the community college workforce training incentive program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24SenateNew draft substituted, as amended, see S2183
2016-03-24SenateRead second
2016-03-17SenatePlaced in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 24, 2016
2016-03-17SenateOrder relative to subject matter adopted
2016-03-17SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a new draft, see S2183
2016-01-19SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2015-08-04JointHearing scheduled for 09/16/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

S2183 (Replaced by) 2016-03-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S660 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2102
S578 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S687 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Accompanied H1070
S568 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
H1074 (Similar To) 2016-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3955

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback