MA S578 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2356

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to require MassHealth to cover certified peer specialist services. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to mental health certified peer specialists

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-23SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2356
2015-06-19JointHearing scheduled for 06/24/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

S2356 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S585 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S620 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S592 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S593 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S570 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S983 (Similar To) 2016-01-28 - New draft substituted, see S2107
S491 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S997 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1980
S490 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1999 (Similar To) 2016-07-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 166 of the Acts of 2016

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback