MA H1074 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H3955

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3955
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to tuition and charges at the University of Massachusetts. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing tuition retention at the University of Massachusetts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-21HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H3955
2015-08-04JointHearing scheduled for 09/16/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

H3955 (Replaced by) 2016-01-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H944 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1032 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H2056 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H945 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H943 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback