MA H2056 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4242

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Scibak of South Hadley, a petition of John W. Scibak and Benjamin Swan that the Board of Registration in Pharmacy be authorized to provide for the establishment and operation of a cancer drug repository program. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the establishment and operation of a cancer drug repository program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-05HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4242
2015-11-20JointHearing scheduled for 12/03/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 and A-2
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H4242 (Replaced by) 2016-05-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H944 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1032 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H945 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H943 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H263 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback