MA H944 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4111

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to insurance coverage for pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders associated with streptococcal infections and pediatric acute-onset neuropsychiatric syndrome. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to insurance coverage for PANDAS/PANS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-28HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4111
2015-10-29JointHearing scheduled for 11/05/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H4111 (Replaced by) 2016-04-04 - Reported, in part, by H948
H1032 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H2056 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H945 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H943 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H263 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback