MA H1032 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4635

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the management of early childhood caries among MassHealth patients. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to cost reduction in the Medicaid program by improving early childhood oral health

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-26HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4635
2015-09-09JointHearing scheduled for 09/22/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

H4635 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H944 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H2056 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H945 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H943 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H263 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback