MA S2183 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

The committee on Ways and Means, to whom was referred the Senate Bill expanding the community college workforce training incentive program (Senate, No. 657),-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2183).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding the community college workforce training incentive program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-28HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2016-03-24SenatePassed to be engrossed - Roll Call #257 [YEAS 37 - NAYS 0]
2016-03-24SenateRead third
2016-03-24SenateOrdered to a third reading
2016-03-24SenateSubstituted, as amended, for S657
2016-03-24SenateAmendment #1 (Tarr) adopted - Roll Call #256 [YEAS 37 - NAYS 0]
2016-03-17SenatePlaced in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 24, 2016
2016-03-17SenateRecommended new draft for S657
2016-03-17SenateReported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

S657 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2183
S1691 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets
S1901 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
H3905 (Similar To) 2015-12-17 - Placed on file
S687 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Accompanied H1070
S568 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback