MA S687 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H1070

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Accompanied H1070
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to community college tuition. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to community college tuition

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-10HouseAccompanied H1070
2015-09-09JointHearing scheduled for 10/07/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

H1070 (Replaced by) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S666 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S1907 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4084
S653 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2102
S274 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
S136 (Similar To) 2016-02-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S565 (Similar To) 2016-05-25 - Accompanied H1024
S575 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S571 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1830 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S576 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback