MA S616 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2734
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special commission to scope a state grant or low interest loan program for properties prone to flooding. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Creating a special commission to scope a state grant or low interest loan program for properties prone to flooding
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] | Sen. Susan Moran [D] |
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2734 |
2021-11-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/07/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H874 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2734 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1022 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2734 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1022 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S616 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S616.pdf |