MA S562 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2543

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to health insurance coverage by athletic trainers. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting consumer choice in health care

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2543
2019-06-26JointHearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H1115 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1116 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1050 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S540 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H909 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S613 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - New draft substituted, see S2935
H947 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S670 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S711 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2340 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2543 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback