MA S711 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to coverage for chronic illness. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to coverage for chronic illness
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-03-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H1115 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1116 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1050 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1715 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1110 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S613 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - New draft substituted, see S2935
H945 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H947 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1116 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1050 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1715 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1110 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S613 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - New draft substituted, see S2935
H945 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H947 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S711 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S711.pdf |