MA H909 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to require health care coverage for emergency psychiatric services. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To require health care coverage for the emergency psychiatric services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-02HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-05-30JointHearing rescheduled to 06/06/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in 222
2019-05-29JointHearing scheduled for 06/06/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H1126 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S596 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S35 (Similar To) 2019-07-12 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S585 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S590 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H1120 (Similar To) 2019-11-13 - Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
H162 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback