MA H1126 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to ensure affordable health connector coverage. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To ensure affordable health connector coverage

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-06-04JointHearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

H1152 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
H1216 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Reporting date extended to Friday November 20, 2020, pending concurrence
H612 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S1750 (Similar To) 2019-07-17 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S817 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
S379 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback