MA S35 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-12 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-12 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure continuous healthcare coverage for youth who have aged-out of the Department of Children and Families. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Ensuring continuous healthcare coverage for youth who have aged-out of the department of children and families
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2019-05-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S344 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3354 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2293 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H1606 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H2706 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H545 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2362 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4161 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2399 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - New draft substituted, see S2459
H3354 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2293 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H1606 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H2706 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H545 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2362 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4161 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2399 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - New draft substituted, see S2459
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S35 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S35.pdf |