MA H1120 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5160
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to require health care coverage for medically necessary treatment for disease, illness, injury, or bodily dysfunction required by a student's individual educational program. Financial Services.
Title
To require health care coverage for medically necessary treatment for disease, illness, injury, or bodily dysfunction required by a student's individual educational program
Sponsors
Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D] | Rep. Mindy Domb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5160 |
2019-11-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S235 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S328 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S559 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H1582 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2248 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4135 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Adopted, see S2365
H4137 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Published as amended, see H4145
H4145 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - See S2365
S2398 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S328 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S559 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H1582 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2248 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4135 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Adopted, see S2365
H4137 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Published as amended, see H4145
H4145 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - See S2365
S2398 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1120 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1120.pdf |