MA S2726 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2386
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the expansion of the commuter rail and ferry low-income fare program, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2726).
Title
Relative to the expansion of the commuter rail low-income fare program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-03-03 | Senate | New draft of S2386 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2386 (Replaces) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2726
S2291 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2387 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
H3526 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4481
H4481 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2317 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2682
S2375 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2291 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2387 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
H3526 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4481
H4481 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2317 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2682
S2375 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2726 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2726.pdf |