MA H3526 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4481
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4481
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4481
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Madaro of Boston, a petition of Adrian C. Madaro and others that the Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority implement a low-income fare program to provide free or discounted transit fares for certain riders. Transportation.
Title
Relative to low income transit fares
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4481 |
2021-07-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2021 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2317 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2682
H3134 (Similar To) 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4910
H3461 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3442 (Similar To) 2021-09-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4113
S2375 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2280 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2707
S2281 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1890 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4562
H4481 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3134 (Similar To) 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4910
H3461 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3442 (Similar To) 2021-09-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4113
S2375 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2280 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2707
S2281 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1890 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4562
H4481 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3526 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3526.pdf |