MA S2717 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish appointed positions of district clerk and district treasurer for the North Raynham water district. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Establishing appointed positions of district clerk and district treasurer for the North Raynham water district
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2024-03-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-03-28 | House | House concurred |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H3808 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2024
H3582 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4574 (Similar To) 2024-06-27 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S2857 (Similar To) 2024-09-12 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H4993 (Similar To) 2024-08-12 - See H2049
H3582 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4574 (Similar To) 2024-06-27 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S2857 (Similar To) 2024-09-12 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H4993 (Similar To) 2024-08-12 - See H2049
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2717 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2717.pdf |