MA H3582 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to water flow in the Central Plymouth County Water District. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
Relative to water flow in the Central Plymouth County Water District
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-31 | House | No further action taken |
2024-04-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-04-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3582 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3582.pdf |