MA S2420 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislation to exempt veterans from civil service exam fees, reports the accompanying Order (Senate, No. 2420).
Title
Order relative to authorizing the joint committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs to make an investigation and study of certain current Senate documents relative to veterans
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Accompanied by S2009, S2010, S2011, S2012, S2013, S2015, S2018, S2020, S2021, S2022, S2023, S2024, S2025, S2028, S2031, S2032 and S2033 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S2009 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2010 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2011 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2012 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2013 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2015 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2018 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2020 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2021 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2022 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2023 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2024 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2025 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2028 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2031 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2032 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2033 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2242 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2358 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Reported (in part) by S2006
S2254 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2258 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2256 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1368 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S609 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1413 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S276 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2258
S403 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
S2010 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2011 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2012 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2013 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2015 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2018 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2020 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2021 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2022 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2023 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2024 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2025 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2028 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2031 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2032 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2033 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2242 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2358 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Reported (in part) by S2006
S2254 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2258 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2256 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1368 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S609 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1413 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S276 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2258
S403 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2420 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2420.pdf |