MA S2033 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2420
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt veterans from civil service exam fees. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Exempting veterans from civil service exam fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2420 |
2017-09-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S1755 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1397 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S2011 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2014 (Similar To) 2018-03-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 54 of the Acts of 2018
S1924 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S1460 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S2021 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
H1938 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H214 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H1945 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1946 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1944 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1569 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1807 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1212 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2326
H3819 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2242 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2420 (Replaced by) 2018-05-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1397 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S2011 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2014 (Similar To) 2018-03-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 54 of the Acts of 2018
S1924 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S1460 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S2021 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
H1938 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H214 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H1945 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1946 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1944 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1569 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1807 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1212 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2326
H3819 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2242 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2420 (Replaced by) 2018-05-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2033 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2033.pdf |