MA S2022 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2420
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Massachusetts GI bill to provide tuition and fee waivers for National Guard members and veterans. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Establishing the Massachusetts GI bill to provide tuition and fee waivers for National Guard members and veterans
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas McGee [D] | Rep. Roselee Vincent [D] | Rep. William Crocker [R] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
Rep. Linda Campbell [D] | Rep. Kevin Honan [D] | Sen. Eric Lesser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2420 |
2017-09-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S2420 (Replaced by) 2018-05-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2022 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2022.pdf |