MA S2416 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-24 - Hearing scheduled for 11/30/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Veterans and Federal Affairs Committee
Hearing: Nov 30 @ 1:00 pm in Virtual Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to support military personnel and families. Veterans and Federal Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To support military personnel and families

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-24JointHearing scheduled for 11/30/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs

Same As/Similar To

H3655 (Similar To) 2021-11-24 - Hearing scheduled for 11/30/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2462 (Similar To) 2021-08-31 - Hearing scheduled for 09/07/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2410 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H1594 (Similar To) 2021-11-02 - Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2502 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2558
S2542 (Similar To) 2021-11-24 - Hearing scheduled for 11/30/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H307 (Similar To) 2021-10-20 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3642 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3690 (Similar To) 2021-11-24 - Hearing scheduled for 11/30/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2431 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1968 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - House concurred
S2433 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2502

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback