MA S2433 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2502

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2502
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to military spouse-licensure portability, education and enrollment of dependents. Veterans and Federal Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to military spouse-licensure portability, education and enrollment of dependents

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-26SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2502
2021-06-28JointHearing scheduled for 07/06/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs

Same As/Similar To

H3697 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2502
S2429 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2502
S2410 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3642 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3648 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2502
H3673 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2502 (Replaced by) 2021-10-21 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2558
S2558 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2559
S2559 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback