MA S2317 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on June 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislationfor legislationfor legislation relative to the composition of the board of directors of the Massachusetts Department of Transporation;, report the accompanying Order (Senate, No. 2317).
Title
Transportation matters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Accompanied by S1838, S1841 and S1867 |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1838 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2317
S1841 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2317
S1867 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2317
S2365 (Similar To) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4443 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4450 (Similar To) 2016-07-31 - Section 166 passed over veto - see Roll Call #673 [YEAS 34 - NAYS 4]
H4449 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 394 of the Acts of 2016
H4475 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4530
S254 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2221
S568 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S278 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2346
S2134 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2145 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2177 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
S2204 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S2214 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Reported in part by S679
S2199 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S1231
S2221 (Similar To) 2016-07-26 - New draft substituted, see S2464
S1222 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Accompanied H2007
S2089 (Similar To) 2016-01-11 - See H3684
S2439 (Similar To) -
S2440 (Similar To) -
S508 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1841 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2317
S1867 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2317
S2365 (Similar To) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4443 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4450 (Similar To) 2016-07-31 - Section 166 passed over veto - see Roll Call #673 [YEAS 34 - NAYS 4]
H4449 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 394 of the Acts of 2016
H4475 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4530
S254 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2221
S568 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S278 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2346
S2134 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2145 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2177 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
S2204 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S2214 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Reported in part by S679
S2199 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S1231
S2221 (Similar To) 2016-07-26 - New draft substituted, see S2464
S1222 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Accompanied H2007
S2089 (Similar To) 2016-01-11 - See H3684
S2439 (Similar To) -
S2440 (Similar To) -
S508 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2317 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2317.pdf |