MA S1841 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2317

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2317
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to autonomous vehicles. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to autonomous vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-06SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2317
2015-07-09JointHearing scheduled for 07/15/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

S2317 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1840 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1754 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
S1667 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1881 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1825 (Similar To) 2015-10-15 - Accompanied H3101
S177 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S1609 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1854 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1682 (Similar To) 2016-07-26 - New draft substituted, see S2463
S1716 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1760 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1533 (Similar To) 2015-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1959

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback