MA S2305 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2522
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2522
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2522
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to mitigate the climate impact of private and corporate air travel. Transportation.
Title
To mitigate the climate impact of private and corporate air travel
Sponsors
Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-02 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2522 |
2021-06-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2021 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H90 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3702
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
S1909 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
H857 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Accompanied S537
H4020 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2022
H4059 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2522 (Replaced by) 2021-09-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2535 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3094
S2529 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1302 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S791 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S2140 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S2161 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S217 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S464 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H514 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
H517 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
S1582 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S332 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S532 (Similar To) 2021-11-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S527 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S505 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S805 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S1105 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H5047 (Similar To) 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2022
S3088 (Similar To) 2022-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2022
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
S1909 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
H857 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Accompanied S537
H4020 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2022
H4059 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2522 (Replaced by) 2021-09-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2535 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3094
S2529 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1302 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S791 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S2140 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S2161 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S217 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S464 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H514 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
H517 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
S1582 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S332 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S532 (Similar To) 2021-11-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S527 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S505 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S805 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S1105 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H5047 (Similar To) 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2022
S3088 (Similar To) 2022-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2305 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2305.pdf |