MA H517 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3974
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to sports betting and online gaming and the establishment of a public advancement fund with monies received from such activities. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Relative to sports betting and public funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-19 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3974 |
2021-06-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H514 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
H516 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
H519 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
S278 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
H3974 (Replaced by) 2021-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H3977
H3993 (Similar To) 2022-08-01 - Reported by H5164
S257 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
S269 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Accompanied H3993
H516 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
H519 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
S278 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
H3974 (Replaced by) 2021-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H3977
H3993 (Similar To) 2022-08-01 - Reported by H5164
S257 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
S269 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Accompanied H3993
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H517 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H517.pdf |