MA H3993 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-01 - Reported by H5164
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-01 - Reported by H5164
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House bill No. 3977, as changed by the committee on Bills in the Third Reading, and as amended and passed to be engrossed by the House. July 22, 2021.
Title
Regulating sports wagering
Sponsors
House House Committee on Ways and Means | House Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies | Rep. Daniel Cahill [D] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-23 - House - House Passed to be engrossed - 156 YEAS to 3 NAYS (Y: 156 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-01 | House | Reported by H5164 |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Committee of conference appointed (Rodrigues-Lesser-O'Connor), in concurrence |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Senate insisted on its amendment |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-05-17 | House | Committee of conference appointed (Parisella-Michlewitz-Muradian) |
2022-05-17 | House | House NON-concurred in the Senate amendment |
2022-05-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Reprinted as amended, see S2862 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read third |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and insetting in place thereof the text of S2844 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read second |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, April 28, 2022 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2844 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Also based on S269 |
2021-07-26 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-07-23 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 156 YEAS to 3 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 74 ) |
2021-07-22 | House | H3977, published as amended |
Same As/Similar To
H3977 (Replaces) 2021-07-22 - Published as amended, see H3993
H506 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
H3974 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H3977
S269 (Replaces) 2022-04-25 - Accompanied H3993
S2862 (Replaces) 2022-04-28 - See H3993
H5164 (Replaces) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2022
H506 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
H3974 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H3977
S269 (Replaces) 2022-04-25 - Accompanied H3993
S2862 (Replaces) 2022-04-28 - See H3993
H5164 (Replaces) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3993 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3993.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/HouseRollCall74.pdf |