MA H3974 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H70
Note: Legislation replaced by H3977
Note: Legislation replaced by H3977
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on July 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H3977
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H3977
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To regulate sports wagering
Title
To regulate sports wagering
Sponsors
House Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies | Rep. Daniel Cahill [D] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-21 | House | New draft substituted, see H3977 |
2021-07-21 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2021-07-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-07-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2021-07-21 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2021-07-21 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a bill, see H3977 |
2021-07-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-07-19 | House | New draft of H70, H502, H506, H514, H515, H516, H517, H518, H519, H531, H535 and H3832 |
2021-07-19 | House | Reported from the committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H70 (Replaces) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
H506 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
S278 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
S257 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
H3977 (Replaced by) 2021-07-22 - Published as amended, see H3993
H3993 (Similar To) 2022-08-01 - Reported by H5164
H5164 (Similar To) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2022
H506 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
S278 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
S257 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
H3977 (Replaced by) 2021-07-22 - Published as amended, see H3993
H3993 (Similar To) 2022-08-01 - Reported by H5164
H5164 (Similar To) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3974 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3974.pdf |