MA S269 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Accompanied H3993
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish sports wagering in the Commonwealth. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To establish sports wagering in the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-25SenateAccompanied H3993
2021-07-21SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2021-07-21SenateAccompanied by S254, S257, S263, S264, S278 and S281
2021-06-09JointHearing scheduled for 06/17/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies

Same As/Similar To

H514 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
H516 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
H517 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
S272 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2710
S257 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
S254 (Replaces) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
S263 (Replaces) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
S264 (Replaces) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
S278 (Replaces) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
S281 (Replaces) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
H3993 (Replaced by) 2022-04-28 - Passed to be engrossed

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback