MA H3977 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H3974
Note: Legislation replaced by H3993

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-22 - Published as amended, see H3993
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Regulating sports wagering

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulating sports wagering

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-22 - House - House Quorum Roll Call - 160 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-22 - House - House Passed to be engrossed - 156 YEAS to 3 NAYS (Y: 156 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-22 - House - House Amendment 3 adopted, as changed - 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-22HousePublished as amended, see H3993
2021-07-22HouseAmendment 29 adopted
2021-07-22HouseAmendment 3 adopted, as changed - 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 73 )
2021-07-22HouseQuorum Roll Call - 160 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 72 )
2021-07-22HouseAmendment 5 adopted, as changed
2021-07-22HouseAmendment 2 adopted, as changed
2021-07-22HouseAmendment 17 adopted
2021-07-22HouseAmendment 9 adopted, as changed
2021-07-22HouseAmendment 12 adopted, as changed
2021-07-22HouseAmendment 27 adopted, as changed
2021-07-22HouseAmendment 21 adopted, as changed
2021-07-22HouseAmendment 16 adopted, as changed
2021-07-22HouseAmendment 20 adopted, as changed
2021-07-22HouseAmendment 19 adopted, as changed
2021-07-22HouseAmendment 10 adopted, as changed
2021-07-22HouseRead third
2021-07-22HouseRules suspended
2021-07-21HouseOrdered to a third reading
2021-07-21HouseNew draft of H3974
2021-07-21HousePending new draft of H3974
2021-07-21HouseReported from the committee on House Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

H3974 (Replaces) 2021-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H3977
H506 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
H516 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
H3993 (Replaced by) 2021-07-26 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback