MA S2294 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-22 - Amendment #1 (Speliotis) adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the membership of the licensing commission and board of election commissioners of the city of Somerville. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the membership of the licensing commission and board of election commissioners of the city of Somerville

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-22HouseAmendment #1 (Speliotis) adopted
2018-10-22HousePassed to be engrossed
2018-10-22HouseAmendment adopted
2018-10-22HouseAmendment rejected
2018-10-22HouseMotion to reconsider prevailed
2018-10-18HouseRead third, amended and passed to be engrossed
2018-05-03HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-05-03HouseRules suspended
2018-05-03HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-04-12HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-04-11SenateRead third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2018-04-11SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2018-03-15SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-03-01SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2018-02-08HouseHouse concurred
2018-02-07SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H4085 (Similar To) 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 92 of the Acts of 2018
H2788 (Similar To) 2017-06-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4309 (Similar To) 2018-11-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 298 of the Acts of 2018
H4365 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4709
H4580 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 197 of the Acts of 2018
H4582 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4662
S2664 (Similar To) 2018-10-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4951 (Similar To) 2018-11-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback