MA H4085 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 92 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the city of Somerville be authorized to increase the maximum age for appointment as a special police officer in said city. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing The Maximum Age To Be Eligible For Appointment As A Special Police Officer In The City Of Somerville

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 92 of the Acts of 2018
2018-05-21SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2018-05-21HouseEnacted
2018-05-17SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-05-17SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2018-03-22SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-03-09SenateRead and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2018-03-06HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-02-07HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-02-07HouseRules suspended
2018-02-07HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-01-31HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-01-17JointHearing scheduled for 01/23/2018 from 11:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2017-12-21SenateSenate concurred
2017-12-18HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S2138 (Similar To) 2017-09-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2017
H3885 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 87 of the Acts of 2017
S1371 (Similar To) 2018-01-26 - Accompanied S1328
S1452 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2017
S1377 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4146 (Similar To) 2018-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 280 of the Acts of 2018
H1380 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1385 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2664 (Similar To) 2018-11-26 - New draft substituted, see S2676
H4918 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4951 (Similar To) 2018-12-10 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
S2676 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback