MA S2664 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on September 24 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-10-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to amend the charter of the city of Somerville. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the charter of the city of Somerville

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-25SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2018-09-27HouseHouse concurred
2018-09-24SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H1097 (Similar To) 2017-09-28 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3930
H259 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H2865 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
S314 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
S1131 (Similar To) 2018-07-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 147 of the Acts of 2018
H4948 (Similar To) 2018-11-15 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4951 (Similar To) 2018-11-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback