MA H4918 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-12-06 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the town of Stoughton be authorized to appoint special police officers in said town. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the appointment of special police officers in the town of Stoughton

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-06SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2018-11-29HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-10-18HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-10-18HouseRules suspended
2018-10-18HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-10-11HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-10-03JointHearing scheduled for 10/09/2018 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in A-1
2018-10-01SenateSenate concurred
2018-09-27HouseReferred to the committee on Public Service.

Same As/Similar To

S1371 (Similar To) 2018-01-26 - Accompanied S1328
S1452 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2017
S1377 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1380 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1385 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback