MA H4309 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the city of Somerville be authorized to offer exemptions for certain owner occupied residential properties for water and sewer charges and rates. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the city of Somerville to offer an exemption for certain owner occupied residential properties for water and sewer charges and rates

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-05SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2018-11-05HouseEnacted
2018-11-01SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-11-01SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2018-10-04SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2018-10-01HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-05-07HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-05-07HouseRules suspended
2018-05-07HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-04-12HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-03-19SenateSenate concurred
2018-03-15HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H4085 (Similar To) 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 92 of the Acts of 2018
H3882 (Similar To) 2017-09-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2788 (Similar To) 2017-06-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H690 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S748 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
S1139 (Similar To) 2017-06-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 21 of the Acts of 2017
H4914 (Similar To) 2018-10-22 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S2664 (Similar To) 2018-10-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4951 (Similar To) 2018-11-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback