MA H4914 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on December 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 319 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on December 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 319 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Chicopee be authorized to establish a water and sewer department in said city. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Chicopee to establish a water and sewer department
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Wagner [D] | Sen. Eric Lesser [D] | Sen. Donald Humason [R] | Sen. James Welch [D] |
Rep. Jose Tosado [D] | Rep. Michael Finn [D] | Rep. Thomas Petrolati [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-06 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 319 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-11-29 | House | Enacted |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-10-22 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-10-18 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-10-11 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-10-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-10-11 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-10-04 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-09-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-09-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H690 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S748 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
H2781 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 26 of the Acts of 2017
H3942 (Similar To) 2018-02-16 - Signed by the Governor. Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2018
H4309 (Similar To) 2018-11-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 298 of the Acts of 2018
H4933 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 406 of the Acts of 2018
S748 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
H2781 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 26 of the Acts of 2017
H3942 (Similar To) 2018-02-16 - Signed by the Governor. Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2018
H4309 (Similar To) 2018-11-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 298 of the Acts of 2018
H4933 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 406 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4914 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4914.pdf |