MA H4580 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 197 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to reconstruction of the state funded Clarendon Hill Public Housing Project by the Somerville Housing Authority in the city of Somerville. Housing. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the Somerville Housing Authority to reconstruct the state funded Clarendon Hill public housing project

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-09 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 197 of the Acts of 2018
2018-07-31SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2018-07-31HouseEnacted
2018-07-31SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-07-31SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2018-07-31SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2018-07-31HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-07-31HouseRules suspended
2018-07-31HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-07-31HouseRules suspended
2018-07-31HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-07-31HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-07-23HouseBill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2018-07-16HouseRecommitted to the committee on Housing
2018-07-16HouseRules suspended
2018-07-16HouseCommittee recommended ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10)
2018-07-03JointHearing scheduled for 07/10/2018 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2018-06-11SenateSenate concurred
2018-06-07HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

S1139 (Similar To) 2017-06-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 21 of the Acts of 2017
H2788 (Similar To) 2017-06-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3882 (Similar To) 2017-09-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4085 (Similar To) 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 92 of the Acts of 2018
S2294 (Similar To) 2018-10-22 - Amendment #1 (Speliotis) adopted
H4802 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted
S2664 (Similar To) 2018-10-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4951 (Similar To) 2018-11-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback