MA H4582 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4662
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4662
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4662
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Somerville be authorized to impose a real estate transfer fee on certain real estate transactions in said city. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the City of Somerville to impose a real estate transfer fee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4662 |
2018-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2018 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2 |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-06-07 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1139 (Similar To) 2017-06-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 21 of the Acts of 2017
H2794 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2788 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3882 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4085 (Similar To) 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 92 of the Acts of 2018
H4662 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2664 (Similar To) 2018-11-26 - New draft substituted, see S2676
H4951 (Similar To) 2019-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 364 of the Acts of 2018
S2676 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 355 of the Acts of 2018
H2794 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2788 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3882 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4085 (Similar To) 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 92 of the Acts of 2018
H4662 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2664 (Similar To) 2018-11-26 - New draft substituted, see S2676
H4951 (Similar To) 2019-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 364 of the Acts of 2018
S2676 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 355 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4582 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4582.pdf |