MA S2288 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize the town of Marblehead to amend Chapter 37 of the Acts of 2004: Parking Violations in the Town of Marblehead. Transportation. [Local approval received]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the town of Marblehead to amend Chapter 37 of the Acts of 2004: Parking Violations in the Town of Marblehead

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-10SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2022-01-24SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2021-12-06JointHearing scheduled for 12/13/2021 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

S42 (Similar To) 2021-10-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1324 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
S1354 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S2778
S2482 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - New draft substituted, see S2799
H3916 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2022
S2491 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - New draft substituted, see S2588
H3948 (Similar To) 2021-11-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 81 of the Acts of 2021
H3453 (Similar To) 2022-01-27 - Accompanied H3535

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback