MA S2978 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the city of Gloucester to increase parking fines
Title
Authorizing the city of Gloucester to increase parking fines
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-07-06 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-07-05 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-05 | Senate | Substituted for S42 |
2022-07-05 | Senate | Recommended new draft (Tarr) for S42 |
Same As/Similar To
S191 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S2288 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S805 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S2270 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2682
S1104 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S42 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - New draft substituted (Tarr), see S2978
H3563 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5258
S2479 (Similar To) 2021-09-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2021
S34 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Reprinted as amended, see S2479
S2288 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S805 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S2270 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2682
S1104 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S42 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - New draft substituted (Tarr), see S2978
H3563 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5258
S2479 (Similar To) 2021-09-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2021
S34 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Reprinted as amended, see S2479
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2978 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2978.pdf |