MA H3916 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to changing the name of the board of selectmen to select board in the town of Norwell. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to changing the name of the board of selectmen in the town of Norwell
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-05-04 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-04-26 | House | Enacted |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2021-11-15 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-09-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-09-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-09-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2021-09-23 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-09-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-06-28 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2482 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - New draft substituted, see S2799
S2288 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1320 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Accompanied H2184
S1354 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S2778
S2491 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - New draft substituted, see S2588
H3948 (Similar To) 2021-11-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 81 of the Acts of 2021
S2876 (Similar To) 2022-12-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 292 of the Acts of 2022
H5063 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2288 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1320 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Accompanied H2184
S1354 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S2778
S2491 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - New draft substituted, see S2588
H3948 (Similar To) 2021-11-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 81 of the Acts of 2021
S2876 (Similar To) 2022-12-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 292 of the Acts of 2022
H5063 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3916 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3916.pdf |