MA S1320 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2184
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-15 - Accompanied H2184
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-15 - Accompanied H2184
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to zoning for flood insurance rate maps by cities and towns. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to emergency action on FEMA Flood Insurance Rate Maps
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Brady [D] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
Sen. John Keenan [D] | Sen. Susan Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | House | Accompanied H2184 |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H2184 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2482 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - New draft substituted, see S2799
S2288 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1032 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3916 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2022
S2491 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - New draft substituted, see S2588
H3948 (Similar To) 2021-11-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 81 of the Acts of 2021
S467 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5284
S1334 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2082 (Similar To) 2022-07-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5031
S2482 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - New draft substituted, see S2799
S2288 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1032 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3916 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2022
S2491 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - New draft substituted, see S2588
H3948 (Similar To) 2021-11-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 81 of the Acts of 2021
S467 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5284
S1334 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2082 (Similar To) 2022-07-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5031
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1320 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1320.pdf |