MA H3948 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 81 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the board of selectmen of the town of Fairhaven. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the Board of Selectmen of the town of Fairhaven

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-01 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 81 of the Acts of 2021
2021-10-25SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2021-10-25HouseEnacted
2021-10-21SenateRead third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2021-10-21SenateTaken out of the Notice Section
2021-10-18SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2021-10-14HouseRead third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2021-09-27HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2021-09-27HouseRules suspended
2021-09-27HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2021-09-23HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2021-09-03JointHearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-07-15SenateSenate concurred
2021-07-14HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H3916 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2482 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2491 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2782 (Similar To) 2021-10-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2288 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - House concurred
H3386 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1747 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1354 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback